Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1017 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6801 Week
» 28190 Month
» 147717 Year
» 3174570 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2279 |
15/02/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2279 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
13/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
23/05/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2279 |
|
|