Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1001 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14407 Week
» 67423 Month
» 186950 Year
» 3213803 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2276 |
09/08/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2276 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
30/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2276 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A R Adams: Newport, Gwent |
|
|