Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1044 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18847 Week
» 71863 Month
» 191390 Year
» 3218243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11157 |
10/05/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2238 |
10/03/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/05/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/05/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11157 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2238 |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2238 |
|
|
11/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Manvers Main |
|
|