Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 3026 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 29060 Week
» 127705 Month
» 330369 Year
» 3357222 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
2237 |
on |
07/11/1944 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
2251 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
347 |
To Service |
Mon 07/11/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1959 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
ALLOC |
89C |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1944 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2237 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Worcester (WOS) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
15/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2237 |
|
|
04/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|