Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2817 Today
» 5610 Yesterday
» 29996 Week
» 21052 Month
» 367476 Year
» 3394329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D223 |
05/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40023 |
02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
LANCASTRIA |
22/04/1961 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
05/08/1959 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/08/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D223 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Naming |
Named 'LANCASTRIA' |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
02/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40023 |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40023 |
|
|
12/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|