Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3850 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17256 Week
» 70272 Month
» 189799 Year
» 3216652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11135 |
28/11/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2229 |
29/10/1960 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
04 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Drewry Car Co. Ltd. |
To Service |
28/11/1955 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
31/12/1969 |
Time in Service |
14 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys |
Information |
Withdrawn as surplus to requirements |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/11/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/11/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11135 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
29/10/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2229 |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
31/12/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2229 |
|
|