Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 471 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19382 Week
» 84336 Month
» 287000 Year
» 3313853 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11128 |
08/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2222 |
23/01/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11128 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2222 |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
28/10/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2222 |
|
|
04/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|