Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2271 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15677 Week
» 68693 Month
» 188220 Year
» 3215073 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11127 |
04/09/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2221 |
25/04/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/09/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11127 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/04/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2221 |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
13/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2221 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|