Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 34 Online
» 4270 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19882 Week
» 118527 Month
» 321191 Year
» 3348044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11114 |
23/10/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2213 |
31/07/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/10/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/10/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11114 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
31/07/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2213 |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
17/08/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2213 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Manvers Main |
|
|