Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 88 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17891 Week
» 70907 Month
» 190434 Year
» 3217287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11112 |
25/09/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2211 |
11/07/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/09/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11112 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2211 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
To Store |
To Store at Feltham (70B) (Unserviceable) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
18/07/1970 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
19/07/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2211 |
|
|
11/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Rees Industries: Llanelli |
|
|