Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 191 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17994 Week
» 71010 Month
» 190537 Year
» 3217390 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11110 |
14/03/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2209 |
04/10/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11110 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2209 |
|
|
05/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
To Store |
To Store at Feltham (70B) (Unserviceable) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2209 |
|
|
10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Kiverton |
|
|