04/08/1939 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 2203 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
30/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
10/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
26/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
25/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
18/04/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
27/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
30/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2203 |
|
|
11/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|