Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1462 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19265 Week
» 72281 Month
» 191808 Year
» 3218661 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11100 |
17/05/1952 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2200 |
01/10/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/05/1952 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/05/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11100 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2200 |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
24/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (86C) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
04/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2200 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by A Findlay: Worsborough |
|
|