Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 494 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6278 Week
» 27667 Month
» 147194 Year
» 3174047 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2196 |
08/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03196 |
01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
08/06/1961 to Swindon (82C) |
Withdrawn |
12/06/1983 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs , 4 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
11/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
01/12/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2196 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
To Store |
To Store (at 85A) |
|
|
05/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/12/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03196 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (CR) |
|
|
08/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BC) |
|
|
12/06/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03196 |
|
|