Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 715 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14758 Week
» 79712 Month
» 282376 Year
» 3309229 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2170 |
21/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03170 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
21/11/1960 to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
Withdrawn |
03/1989 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
29/10/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2170 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
29/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03170 |
|
|
08/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BC) |
|
|
03/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03170 |
|
|