Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18242 Week
» 71258 Month
» 190785 Year
» 3217638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D215 |
15/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40015 |
11/12/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
AQUITANIA |
16/06/1962 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
15/06/1959 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawn |
13/11/1984 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1986 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Life expired,and coolant problems |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
15/06/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 05/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/06/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D215 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Willesden (1A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Naming |
Named 'AQUITANIA' |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Removed |
|
|
11/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40015 |
|
|
13/11/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40015 |
|
|
11/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|