Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 561 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6345 Week
» 27734 Month
» 147261 Year
» 3174114 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2141 |
04/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03141 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
04/05/1960 to Taunton (83B) |
Withdrawn |
07/07/1985 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 2 mths , 3 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
83B |
|
Taunton (New) |
on |
04/05/1960 |
87E |
|
Landore |
6w/e |
19/09/1965 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
07/07/1985 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/12/1969 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
29/12/1969 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2141 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
19/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
29/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03141 |
|
|
07/07/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03141 |
|
|