Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 818 Today
» 4601 Yesterday
» 818 Week
» 54272 Month
» 400696 Year
» 3427549 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2121 |
16/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03121 |
01/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/12/1969 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1970 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
29/12/1969 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
01/1970 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2121 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
29/12/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03121 |
|
|
03/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03121 |
|
|
28/09/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|