Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1285 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7069 Week
» 28458 Month
» 147985 Year
» 3174838 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2120 |
08/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03120 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
08/10/1959 to Danygraig (87C) |
Withdrawn |
23/02/1986 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Allocations - WIP
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
87C |
|
Danygraig (New) |
on |
08/10/1959 |
87E |
|
Landore |
6w/e |
13/04/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
23/02/1986 |
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1972 |
|
Cab height reduced |
|
|
|
|
30/03/1972 |
|
Cab height reduced |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2120 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Cab height reduced |
|
|
30/03/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Cab height reduced |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03120 |
|
|
23/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03120 |
|
|