Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1242 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7026 Week
» 28415 Month
» 147942 Year
» 3174795 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D212 |
25/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40012 |
02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
97407 |
20/05/1985 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
AUREOL |
20/09/1960 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 40 | 25/05/1959 | 97/4 | 20/05/1985 |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
25/05/1959 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawn |
04/04/1986 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Information |
Loco has 9in crack in bogies frame |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
25/05/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/09/1960 |
E.4983 |
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
£302/-/- |
|
£302/-/- |
16/06/1962 |
R.11194 |
Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
£17/8/10 |
|
£17/8/10 |
16/06/1962 |
R/11235 |
Fitting of safety catches to roof hatches |
|
£15/10/7 |
|
£15/10/7 |
05/06/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/05/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/09/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
05/06/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D212 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Willesden (1A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
20/09/1960 |
Naming |
Named 'AUREOL' by Mr. M.Glaister, Director of the Elder Dempster Shipping Line at Liverpool Riverside Station |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Engine hours recorder fitted |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitting of safety catches to roof hatches |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
05/06/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
11/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40012 |
|
|
20/05/1985 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
20/05/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 97407 |
|
|
04/04/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 97407 |
|
|