Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1091 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6875 Week
» 28264 Month
» 147791 Year
» 3174644 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2119 |
25/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03119 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
25/09/1959 to Danygraig (87C) |
Withdrawn |
23/02/1986 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2119 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
19/12/1970 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03119 |
|
|
23/02/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03119 |
|
|