Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1463 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7247 Week
» 28636 Month
» 148163 Year
» 3175016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2112 |
09/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03112 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
09/12/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1987 |
Time in Service |
26 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/10/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
23/10/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2112 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
23/10/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
18/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
20/02/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03112 |
|
|
05/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03112 |
|
|