Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3777 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17183 Week
» 70199 Month
» 189726 Year
» 3216579 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2106 |
15/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03106 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/10/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2106 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03106 |
|
|
17/09/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03106 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Hesslewoods: Attercliffe |
|
|