Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1122 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14528 Week
» 67544 Month
» 187071 Year
» 3213924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D21 |
03/03/1961 |
|
TOPS (45/0) |
45026 |
02/1975 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
45 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Box No Gangway |
|
To Service |
03/03/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
07/04/1986 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
14/02/1989 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/03/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
31/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D21 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
02/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 45026 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
07/04/1986 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 45026 |
|
|
14/02/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|