Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 367 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18170 Week
» 71186 Month
» 190713 Year
» 3217566 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2093 |
28/05/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2093 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
22/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2093 |
|
|
04/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|