Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1178 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 28351 Month
» 147878 Year
» 3174731 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2078 |
24/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03078 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
24/12/1959 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
08/01/1988 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs , 15 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 04/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/09/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
14/09/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2078 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03078 |
|
|
08/01/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03078 |
|
|