Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 492 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6276 Week
» 27665 Month
» 147192 Year
» 3174045 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2069 |
19/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03069 |
11/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
19/09/1959 to West Hartlepool (51C) |
Withdrawn |
27/11/1983 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1983 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2069 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03069 |
|
|
25/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
27/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03069 |
|
|
12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|