Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4074 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22985 Week
» 87939 Month
» 290603 Year
» 3317456 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2064 |
23/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03064 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2064 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
13/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03064 |
|
|
21/06/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03064 |
|
|
08/1981 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|