Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3490 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16896 Week
» 69912 Month
» 189439 Year
» 3216292 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2062 |
03/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03062 |
12/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
03/07/1959 to Selby (50C) |
Withdrawn |
12/10/1980 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2062 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
01/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
13/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
24/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03062 |
|
|
12/10/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03062 |
|
|