Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1304 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7088 Week
» 28477 Month
» 148004 Year
» 3174857 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2027 |
16/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03027 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
16/09/1958 to Lincoln (40A) |
Withdrawn |
31/01/1976 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2027 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
31/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
26/12/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03027 |
|
|
31/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03027 |
|
|