Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 8 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17811 Week
» 70827 Month
» 190354 Year
» 3217207 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
SR |
CC2 |
09/1945 |
Pre TOPS |
20002 |
03/05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
70 |
Wheels |
C-C |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
09/1945 |
Withdrawn |
12/1968 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys |
Cut Up |
09/1969 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's Newport |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1945 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway number CC2 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
03/05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20002 |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
22/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
12/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20002 |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|