Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 785 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14191 Week
» 67207 Month
» 186734 Year
» 3213587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
SR |
CC1 |
26/07/1941 |
Pre TOPS |
20001 |
02/12/1948 |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1941 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway number CC1 Built at Ashford Works Allocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
02/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20001 |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
22/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
01/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20001 from Brighton (75A) |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|