Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1282 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19085 Week
» 72101 Month
» 191628 Year
» 3218481 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D200 |
14/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40122 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
14/03/1958 to Stratford (30A) |
Withdrawn |
23/08/1981 off Longsight (LO) |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
14/03/1958 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 15/06/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
24/05/1964 |
Unknown |
|
Not known |
Not known |
|
|
07/07/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D200 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stratford (30A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
21/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
30/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
15/06/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40122 |
|
|
23/08/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40122 from Longsight (LO) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|