Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2313 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15719 Week
» 68735 Month
» 188262 Year
» 3215115 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1999 |
25/06/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47297 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/06/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 05/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/06/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 15/02/1969 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1999 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
05/04/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/08/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47297 |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47297 |
|
|
05/2002 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|