Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1441 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14847 Week
» 67863 Month
» 187390 Year
» 3214243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1995 |
23/04/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47293 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
23/04/1966 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
28/02/2007 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
07/2007 |
Cut At |
EMR (Kingsbury) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/04/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1995 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/08/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
04/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47293 |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
28/02/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47293 |
|
|
07/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|