Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1432 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14838 Week
» 67854 Month
» 187381 Year
» 3214234 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1992 |
15/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47290 |
08/09/1973 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57316 |
20/12/2004 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
15/03/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/03/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1992 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
08/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47290 |
|
|
01/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
20/12/2004 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57316 |
|
|