Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2063 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19866 Week
» 72882 Month
» 192409 Year
» 3219262 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1991 |
02/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47289 |
03/11/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/03/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
04/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/03/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
04/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xoh |
Dual brakes, No heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1991 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
03/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47289 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|