Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 4162 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23073 Week
» 88027 Month
» 290691 Year
» 3317544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1985 |
17/01/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47283 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/01/1966 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/01/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1977 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/01/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1985 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47283 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
31/08/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47283 |
|
|
30/09/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|