Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 4238 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34888 Week
» 133533 Month
» 336197 Year
» 3363050 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1979 |
m/e |
11/1890 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Armstrong |
Class |
1901 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road) |
Order Number |
V2 |
Works Number |
518 |
To Service |
During 11/1890 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 21/08/1950 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1890 |
wtd |
|
Cardigan |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
WTD |
|
Whitland |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/08/1950 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
WTD |
Whitland |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1914 |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
02/11/1959 |
Brecon demotion |
Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1890 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1979 Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road), Works Number 518 |
|
|
12/1914 |
Modification |
Diagram B4 boiler fitted |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardigan (wtd) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Whitland (WTD) |
|
|
21/08/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1979 |
|
|