Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4039 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17445 Week
» 70461 Month
» 189988 Year
» 3216841 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1973 |
10/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47272 |
09/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47593 |
09/08/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/11/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/11/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1973 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47272 |
|
|
09/08/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47593 |
|
|