Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 496 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6280 Week
» 27669 Month
» 147196 Year
» 3174049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1970 |
22/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47269 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47643 |
14/03/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
22/10/1965 to Haymarket (64B) |
Withdrawn |
01/04/1991 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/10/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/10/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1970 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47269 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
25/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
14/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47643 |
|
|
01/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47643 |
|
|