Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1340 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14746 Week
» 67762 Month
» 187289 Year
» 3214142 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1969 |
22/10/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47268 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47595 |
11/10/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/10/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/10/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1969 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47268 |
|
|
04/09/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/10/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47595 |
|
|