Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4306 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17712 Week
» 70728 Month
» 190255 Year
» 3217108 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1963 |
17/09/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47263 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47587 |
02/06/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
17/09/1965 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1963 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
27/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47263 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/06/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47587 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/08/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47587 |
|
|
11/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|