Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 147 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17950 Week
» 70966 Month
» 190493 Year
» 3217346 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1959 |
25/02/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47513 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
25/02/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/02/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/02/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
11/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/02/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
11/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/02/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1959 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 621 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47513 |
|
|
11/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
28/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47513 |
|
|
13/05/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|