Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 735 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19646 Week
» 84600 Month
» 287264 Year
» 3314117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1958 |
25/02/1967 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47512 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
25/02/1967 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/06/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
22/06/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/02/1967 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
22/06/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
07/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/02/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1958 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 620 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
22/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
22/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47512 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
01/10/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47512 |
|
|
20/05/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|