Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2620 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16026 Week
» 69042 Month
» 188569 Year
» 3215422 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1951 |
14/10/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47507 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47716 |
03/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/10/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
22/06/1973 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/10/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
22/06/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
09/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
07/1976 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/10/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1951 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 613 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
22/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
23/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47507 |
|
|
07/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
03/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47716 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|