Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2018 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15424 Week
» 68440 Month
» 187967 Year
» 3214820 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1941 |
27/07/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47498 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47711 |
09/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/07/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/07/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
07/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/07/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1941 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 703 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47498 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47711 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/06/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47711 |
|
|
09/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Toton Training Compound |
|
|