Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3708 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17114 Week
» 70130 Month
» 189657 Year
» 3216510 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1936 |
26/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47494 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/7) |
47706 |
06/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
26/03/1966 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1971 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1971 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
07/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1936 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 698 Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47494 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
06/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47706 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
01/04/1995 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47706 |
|
|
08/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|