Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 567 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6351 Week
» 27740 Month
» 147267 Year
» 3174120 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1933 |
02/03/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47255 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47596 |
04/10/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/03/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
12/1982 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/03/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1972 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 06/1974 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1982 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/03/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1933 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 695 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47255 |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
01/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
21/06/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
12/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/10/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47596 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/04/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47596 |
|
|