Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 101 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17904 Week
» 70920 Month
» 190447 Year
» 3217300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1931 |
21/02/1966 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47254 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47651 |
04/07/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47806 |
19/07/1989 |
|
TOPS (57/3) |
57309 |
30/06/2003 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
21/02/1966 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1978 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/02/1966 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/1978 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/02/1966 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1931 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 693 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
19/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47254 |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
05/01/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/07/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47651 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
19/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47806 |
|
|
30/06/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57309 |
|
|